VA SB1338 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Telemedicine services; remote patient monitoring services. Requires the Board of Medical Assistance Services to include in the state plan for medical assistance services a provision for the payment of medical assistance for remote patient monitoring services provided via telemedicine for (i) high-risk pregnant persons; (ii) medically complex infants and children; (iii) transplant patients; (iv) patients who have undergone surgery, for up to three months following the date of such surgery; and (v) patients with a chronic health condition who have had two or more hospitalizations or emergency department visits related to such chronic health condition in the previous 12 months. The services include monitoring of clinical patient data such as weight, blood pressure, pulse, pulse oximetry, blood glucose, and other patient physiological data; treatment adherence monitoring; and interactive video conferencing with or without digital image upload. The bill also clarifies the definition of "telemedicine services" to provide that nothing in the bill precludes coverage for a service that is not a telemedicine service, including real-time audio-only telehealth services. The bill directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services to adopt regulations for reimbursement for telemedicine services delivered through audio-only telephone and to promulgate and adopt uniform regulations for remote patient monitoring for all Medicaid managed care organizations to implement and follow. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telemedicine services; remote patient monitoring services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
2021-02-07HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-02-07HouseRead first time
2021-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-04SenatePrinted as engrossed 21103431D-ES1
2021-02-04SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB1338ES1
2021-02-04SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-02-04SenateReading of amendments waived
2021-02-04SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21103431D-S1
2021-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-04SenateRead second time
2021-02-03SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-25SenateMotion to rerefer to committee agreed to
2021-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2021-01-21SenateCommittee substitute printed 21103431D-S1
2021-01-21SenateIncorporates SB1416 (Stanley)
2021-01-21SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-18SenateAssigned Education sub: Health
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101591D

Same As/Similar To

SB1416 (Similar To) 2021-01-21 - Incorporated by Education and Health
SB1416 (Similar To) 2021-01-21 - Incorporated by Education and Health

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321325(n/a)See Bill Text
3823418.16(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+SB1338
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1338+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1338S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1338ES1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103290D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+SB1338AS
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1338FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1338FES1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S04V0047+SB1338
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0080SB1338+SB1338
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S05V0121+SB1338
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0304SB1338+SB1338
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0305SB1338+SB1338

Bill Comments 750

feedback