VA SB1335 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1335
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0381)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0381)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Learner's permits; use of personal communications device. Eliminates the provisions prohibiting a holder of a learner's permit or a holder of a provisional driver's license from operating a vehicle while using a wireless telecommunications device. Such provisions were specific only to the holder of a learner's permit or a provisional driver's license. Under a different current law, all drivers, including those with a learner's permit or a provisional driver's license, are prohibited from holding a handheld personal communications device while operating a vehicle. Learner's permits; use of personal communications device. Eliminates the provisions prohibiting a holder of a learner's permit or a holder of a provisional driver's license from operating a vehicle while using a wireless telecommunications device. Such provisions were specific only to the holder of a learner's permit or a provisional driver's license. Under a different current law, all drivers, including those with a learner's permit or a provisional driver's license, are prohibited from holding a handheld personal communications device while operating a vehicle.
Title
Learner's permits; use of personal communication devices, restrictions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0381) | |
2021-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 381 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1335ER) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Title replaced 21200108D-H1 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-23 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-23 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-23 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1335H1 |
2021-02-23 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21200108D-H1 |
2021-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-18 | House | Committee substitute printed 21200108D-H1 |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-09 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Innovations and General Topics |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1335S1 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Stuart agreed to 21103709D-S1 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 21103709D-S1 (Stuart) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100741D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1335 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote