VA SB1333 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Pharmaceutical processors; cannabis products. Permits pharmaceutical processors to produce and distribute cannabis products other than cannabis oil. The bill defines the terms "botanical cannabis," "cannabis product," and "usable cannabis." The bill requires the Board of Pharmacy to establish testing standards for botanical cannabis and botanical cannabis products, establish a registration process for botanical cannabis products, and promulgate emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill. The bill allows the Board of Pharmacy to assess and collect botanical cannabis regulatory fees to cover costs associated with the implementation of the provisions of the bill, including costs for new personnel, training, promulgation of regulations and guidance documents, and information technology. Pharmaceutical processors; cannabis products. Permits pharmaceutical processors to produce and distribute cannabis products other than cannabis oil. The bill defines the terms "botanical cannabis," "cannabis product," and "usable cannabis." The bill requires the Board of Pharmacy to establish testing standards for botanical cannabis and botanical cannabis products, establish a registration process for botanical cannabis products, and promulgate emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill. The bill allows the Board of Pharmacy to assess and collect botanical cannabis regulatory fees to cover costs associated with the implementation of the provisions of the bill, including costs for new personnel, training, promulgation of regulations and guidance documents, and information technology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmaceutical processors; permits processors to produce & distribute cannabis products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 5-N) (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
2021-02-07HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-02-07HouseRead first time
2021-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-05SenateRead third time and passed Senate (32-Y 5-N)
2021-02-05SenatePassed by temporarily
2021-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1333S2
2021-02-04SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21104258D-S2
2021-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-04SenateCommittee substitute rejected 21103698D-S1
2021-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-04SenateRead second time
2021-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03SenateCommittee substitute printed 21104258D-S2
2021-02-03SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-28SenateCommittee substitute printed 21103698D-S1
2021-01-28SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 1-N 1-A)
2021-01-22SenateAssigned Education sub: Health
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102491D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182250.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5412519(n/a)See Bill Text
5412521(n/a)See Bill Text
5412903(n/a)See Bill Text
5413408.3(n/a)See Bill Text
5413442.5(n/a)See Bill Text
5413442.8(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+SB1333
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1333+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1333S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1333S2+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21104258D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103698D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1333F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1333FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1333FS2122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S04V0082+SB1333
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S05V0119+SB1333
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0293SB1333+SB1333
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0382SB1333+SB1333

Bill Comments 750

feedback