VA SB1331 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Absentee voting; accessibility for voters with a visual impairment or print disability. Requires the Department of Elections to make available to all localities a tool to allow voters with a visual impairment or print disability to electronically and accessibly receive and mark his absentee ballot using screen reader assistive technology. On receipt of an application for an absentee ballot from an applicant who indicates that he will require assistance due to a visual impairment or print disability, the general registrar is required to offer to provide to the applicant the ballot marking tool with screen reader assistive technology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Absentee voting; accessibility for voters with a visual impairment or print disability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
2021-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-02-05HouseRead first time
2021-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-01SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26SenateReported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-01-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102849D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242103.2(n/a)See Bill Text
242704(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback