VA SB1328 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Removal of elected officers and certain appointed officers; petition for removal. Requires signatures for a petition for removal of an officer to be collected within 90 days. No signatures on such petition shall be collected (i) within 75 days of a primary election or party nomination process in which the officer is a candidate and through the date of the next general election if the officer is the winner of the primary election or party nomination process or (ii) on the date of any general or special election in which the officer is a candidate through the thirtieth day after the officer takes office if the officer is the winner of the general or special election. The bill also requires the petition to be signed by a number of registered voters equal to 30 percent of the total number of votes cast at the last election for the office that the officer whose removal is sought holds. Current law requires the petition to be signed by a number of registered voters equal to 10 percent of the total number of votes cast at such election. Removal of elected officers and certain appointed officers; petition for removal. Requires signatures for a petition for removal of an officer to be collected within 90 days. No signatures on such petition shall be collected (i) within 75 days of a primary election or party nomination process in which the officer is a candidate and through the date of the next general election if the officer is the winner of the primary election or party nomination process or (ii) on the date of any general or special election in which the officer is a candidate through the thirtieth day after the officer takes office if the officer is the winner of the general or special election. The bill also requires the petition to be signed by a number of registered voters equal to 30 percent of the total number of votes cast at the last election for the office that the officer whose removal is sought holds. Current law requires the petition to be signed by a number of registered voters equal to 10 percent of the total number of votes cast at such election.
Title
Removal of officers; elected officers and officers appointed to elected office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 7-N) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 7-N) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2023-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) |
2023-02-13 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2023-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (31-Y 7-N) |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1328S1 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23106060D-S1 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23106060D-S1 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to P&E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102764D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 230 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 233 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 233.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 233.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 234 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 235 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 236 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 237 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 238 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 682 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 688 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 945.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |