VA SB1327 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1327

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0092)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Housing Bill of Rights; housing protections; foreclosures; manufactured housing. Provides for various protections for homeowners and tenants of manufactured home parks, including (i) restricting the circumstances under which a court may order a person's primary residence to be sold to enforce a judgment lien; (ii) requiring localities to incorporate into their comprehensive plans strategies to promote manufactured housing as a source of affordable housing; (iii) requiring the Director of Housing and Community Development to develop a statement of tenant rights and responsibilities explaining in plain language the rights and responsibilities of tenants under the Virginia Manufactured Home Lot Rental Act; (iv) in the case of a deed of trust conveying owner-occupied residential real estate, prohibiting a trustee of such deed of trust from selling such property in a foreclosure sale without receiving an affidavit signed by the party that provided notice of the sale to the owner confirming that such notice was sent to the owner, with a copy of such notice attached to the affidavit; (v) in the case of a deed of trust conveying owner-occupied residential real estate, increasing the notice period for a foreclosure sale from 14 to 60 days and requiring such notice to provide the grantor with information regarding housing counseling; and (vi) requiring the landlord of a manufactured home park to provide tenants who own their manufactured home information about housing assistance and legal aid organizations. The bill also requires the Department of Housing and Community Development to convene a stakeholder group to assist in the development of the statement of tenant rights and responsibilities. The provisions of the bill related to the specifics of the notice that is required before a trustee can sell a property in a foreclosure sale have a delayed effective date of October 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homeowners and tenants of manufactured home parks; housing protections, foreclosures, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (63-Y 35-N) (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0092)
2021-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 92 (effective - see bill)
2021-02-25 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-25SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021
2021-02-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-22SenateSigned by President
2021-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1327ER)
2021-02-22SenateEnrolled
2021-02-18SenateTitle replaced 21200022D-H1
2021-02-18SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 1-N)
2021-02-16HouseVOTE: Passage (63-Y 35-N)
2021-02-16HousePassed House with substitute (63-Y 35-N)
2021-02-16HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1327H1
2021-02-16HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21200022D-H1
2021-02-16HouseRead third time
2021-02-15HouseRead second time
2021-02-11HouseCommittee substitute printed 21200022D-H1
2021-02-11HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
2021-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-02-05HouseRead first time
2021-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-02SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1327S1
2021-02-01SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21103516D-S1
2021-02-01SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-01SenateRead second time
2021-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateCommittee substitute printed 21103516D-S1
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102508D

Same As/Similar To

SB1327 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
HB2175 (Same As) 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0091)
HB2175 (Same As) 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0091)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522223.5(n/a)See Bill Text
5511303(n/a)See Bill Text
551320(n/a)See Bill Text
551321(n/a)See Bill Text
801462(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1327
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1327+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1327S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1327H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1327ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0092+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21200022D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1327F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1327FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1327FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1327FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12C0041+SB1327
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0184SB1327+SB1327
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0228SB1327+SB1327
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H11V0004+SB1327
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1606+SB1327
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0123SB1327+SB1327

Bill Comments

feedback