VA SB1327 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Higher education; in-state tuition. Requires a public institution of higher education to grant a student in-state tuition if participation in a federal educational assistance program is conditioned on such student receiving in-state tuition.
Title
Higher education; in-state tuition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2015-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned App. sub: Higher Education |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 15103349D |