VA SB1327 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-05 - Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-05 - Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; prohibited practice by retail wine and beer licensees; penalty. Provides that no retail off-premises wine and beer licensee shall sell any alcoholic beverage by means of a self-scanning cash register or other point-of-sale system. The bill defines "point-of-sale system" and provides that any person convicted of a violation is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; prohibited practice by retail wine and beer licensees, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (17-Y 23-N) (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (17-Y 23-N) (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (17-Y 23-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (9-Y 6-N) |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 13103187D |