VA SB1327 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0378)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Common interest communities; rules violations; jurisdiction of general district courts. Provides that a court may order the owner of common interest community property who is in violation of such community's rules to abate or remedy the violation. The bill also provides that a general district court may enter default judgment against an owner on the association's sworn affidavit. The bill contains technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Common interest communities; court may enter default judgment against unit owner on sworn affidavit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0378)
2011-03-22 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 378 (effective 7/1/11)
2011-03-06 Senate: Signed by President
2011-03-03 House: Signed by Speaker
2011-03-03 Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1327ER)
2011-03-03 Senate: Enrolled
2011-02-24 House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N)
2011-02-24 House: Passed House (97-Y 2-N)
2011-02-24 House: Read third time
2011-02-23 House: Read second time
2011-02-21 House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
2011-02-07 House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2011-02-07 House: Read first time
2011-02-07 House: Placed on Calendar
2011-02-03 Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N)
2011-02-02 Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1327S1
2011-02-02 Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104811D-S1
2011-02-02 Senate: Reading of substitute waived
2011-02-02 Senate: Read second time
2011-02-01 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2011-01-31 Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
2011-01-31 Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104811D-S1
2011-01-18 Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil
2011-01-12 Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2011-01-12 Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102396D

Same As/Similar To

HB2289 (Same As) 2011-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0372)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16177(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback