VA SB1325 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0756)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0756)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Purchase, etc., of tobacco products by minors; liquid nicotine packaging; penalty. Provides that no person shall sell or distribute at retail a liquid nicotine container on or after October 1, 2015, unless the container is packaged in child-resistant packaging. The bill allows existing inventory to be sold until January 1, 2016. Any person who violates the child-resistant packaging requirements is guilty of a Class 4 misdemeanor. The bill also provides that any adult may sign for tobacco products, nicotine vapor products, or alternative nicotine products purchased through mail order or the Internet. Current law requires the signature of the purchaser.
Title
Nicotine Vapor products; prohibits purchase, etc., by minors, packaging, civil penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0756) | |
2015-04-15 | House | Enacted, Chapter 756 (effective 7/1/15) |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB1325ER2) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Governor's substitute printed 15105833D-S2 |
2015-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/25/15 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1325ER) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-18 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed House with amendments (91-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2015-02-18 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2015-02-18 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | House | VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Constitutional reading dispensed (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2015-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 15104651D-ES1 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB1325ES1 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104651D-S1 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104651D-S1 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 15103654D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2036 (Same As) 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0739)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 371.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 4220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 4221 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |