VA SB1322 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Public schools; seizure management and action plans; biennial training. Provides for the submission and utilization of seizure management and action plans for students with a diagnosed seizure disorder. The bill requires that school nurses and certain school division employees biennially complete Board of Education-approved training in the treatment of students with seizure disorders. The bill provides immunity from civil liability for acts or omissions related to providing for the care of a student under a seizure management and action plan. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2022. Public schools; seizure management and action plans; biennial training. Provides for the submission and utilization of seizure management and action plans for students with a diagnosed seizure disorder. The bill requires that school nurses and certain school division employees biennially complete Board of Education-approved training in the treatment of students with seizure disorders. The bill provides immunity from civil liability for acts or omissions related to providing for the care of a student under a seizure management and action plan. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public schools; seizure management and action plans, biennial training, effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Education by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-26SenateRead third time and passed Senate (35-Y 4-N)
2021-01-25SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1322S1
2021-01-25SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21103009D-S1
2021-01-25SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-01-25SenateRead second time
2021-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2021-01-21SenateCommittee substitute printed 21103009D-S1
2021-01-21SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (10-Y 4-N)
2021-01-13SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100698D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221274.6(n/a)See Bill Text
801225(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback