VA SB1321 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1321
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Confirmatory adoption. Expands the stepparent adoption provisions to allow a person who is not the child's stepparent but has a legitimate interest in the child to file a joint petition for adoption with the child's birth parent or parent by adoption. Confirmatory adoption. Expands the stepparent adoption provisions to allow a person who is not the child's stepparent but has a legitimate interest in the child to file a joint petition for adoption with the child's birth parent or parent by adoption.
Title
Confirmatory adoption; expands the stepparent adoption provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Sen. George Barker [D] | Sen. Monty Mason [D] | Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] |
Sen. Joseph Morrissey [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 13-N) (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 2-N 2-A) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (11-Y 1-N 3-A) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 2-N 2-A) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (11-Y 1-N 3-A) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 13-N) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21102745D-E |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1321E |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 2-N 2-A) |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (11-Y 1-N 3-A) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102745D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1321 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote