VA SB1321 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Licensed family day homes; storage of firearms. Requires that firearms and ammunition in a licensed family day home be stored in a locked closet, cabinet, or container during the family day home's hours of operation. The bill requires that the key or combination to such locked storage places be maintained out of the reach of all children in the family day home.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensed family day homes; storage of firearms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (11-Y 1-N 2-A) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19HouseLeft in Militia, Police and Public Safety
2019-02-14HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12HouseAssigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2019-02-08HouseRead first time
2019-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-05SenatePassed Senate (35-Y 4-N)
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1321S1
2019-02-05SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105893D-S1
2019-02-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-05SenateRead second time
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (11-Y 1-N 2-A)
2019-02-01SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105893D-S1
2019-01-22SenateAssigned Rehab sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-14SenateRereferred to Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-01-14SenateRereferred from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
2019-01-07SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102912D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6321701.01(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback