VA SB1319 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1319
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0503)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0503)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Waste Diversion and Recycling Task Force. Requests the Department of Environmental Quality to continue and expand the scope and membership of the Waste Diversion and Recycling Task Force. The bill directs the Task Force to hold its first meeting of the 2021 interim no later than October 15, 2021, and to publish an executive summary and a report of its findings and recommendations no later than November 1, 2022. Waste Diversion and Recycling Task Force. Requests the Department of Environmental Quality to continue and expand the scope and membership of the Waste Diversion and Recycling Task Force. The bill directs the Task Force to hold its first meeting of the 2021 interim no later than October 15, 2021, and to publish an executive summary and a report of its findings and recommendations no later than November 1, 2022.
Title
Waste Diversion & Recycling Task Force; Department of Environmental Quality to continue Task Force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (11-Y 9-N) (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 16-N) (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (11-Y 9-N) (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 16-N) (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0503) | |
2021-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 503 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1319ER) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Title replaced 21200354D-H1 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N) |
2021-02-25 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) |
2021-02-25 | House | Passed House with substitute (55-Y 44-N) |
2021-02-25 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1319H1 |
2021-02-25 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21200354D-H1 |
2021-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-24 | House | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-22 | House | Reported from Appropriations (11-Y 9-N) |
2021-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) |
2021-02-18 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-17 | House | Committee substitute printed 21200354D-H1 |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (18-Y 4-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-09 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (22-Y 16-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1319S1 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21104441D-S1 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Hanger withdrawn 21104444D-S2 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Substitute by Senator withdrawn 21104444D-S1 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 21104444D-S2 (Hanger) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21104441D-S1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (9-Y 6-N) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102722D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1319 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote