VA SB1319 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0220)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0220)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of Wytheville. Removes provisions that would require a special election to fill certain vacancies in the office of mayor or on the town council, thus subjecting all such vacancies to the existing requirement that vacancies be filled for the remainder of the unexpired term by majority vote of the remaining members on the council.
Title
Wytheville, Town of; amending charter, removes certain provisions requiring special election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0220) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 220 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1319ER) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-14 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-13 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2017-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101236D |