VA SB1318 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1318

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Environmental justice; interagency working group; report. Establishes the Interagency Environmental Justice Working Group as an advisory council in the executive branch of state government to further environmental justice in the Commonwealth and directs each of the Governor's Secretaries to designate at least one environmental justice coordinator to represent the secretariat as a member of the Working Group. The bill provides that the Working Group shall expire on July 1, 2031. Environmental justice; interagency working group; report. Establishes the Interagency Environmental Justice Working Group as an advisory council in the executive branch of state government to further environmental justice in the Commonwealth and directs each of the Governor's Secretaries to designate at least one environmental justice coordinator to represent the secretariat as a member of the Working Group. The bill provides that the Working Group shall expire on July 1, 2031.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interagency Environmental Justice Working Group; established, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 35-N) (Y: 3 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (7-Y 6-N 2-A) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01SenateFailed to pass
2021-03-01SenateNo further action taken
2021-02-25HouseDelegates: Simonds, Keam, Hodges
2021-02-25HouseConferees appointed by House
2021-02-25SenateSenators: Hashmi, Vogel, Mason
2021-02-25SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2021-02-25SenateSenate acceded to request (35-Y 3-N)
2021-02-25HouseHouse requested conference committee
2021-02-25HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2021-02-25SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 35-N)
2021-02-25HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N)
2021-02-25HousePassed House with substitute (55-Y 44-N)
2021-02-25HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1318H1
2021-02-25HouseRead third time
2021-02-24HousePassed by for the day
2021-02-23HousePassed by for the day
2021-02-23HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2021-02-23HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N)
2021-02-23HousePassed House with substitute (55-Y 43-N)
2021-02-23HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1318H1
2021-02-23HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21200450D-H1
2021-02-23HouseRead third time
2021-02-22HouseRead second time
2021-02-18HouseCommittee substitute printed 21200450D-H1
2021-02-18HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
2021-02-07HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-02-07HouseRead first time
2021-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-05SenateRead third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N)
2021-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1318S1
2021-02-04SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21104321D-S1
2021-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-04SenateCommittee amendments rejected
2021-02-04SenateReading of amendments waived
2021-02-04SenateRead second time
2021-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02SenateCommittee substitute printed 21104321D-S1
2021-02-02SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (11-Y 5-N)
2021-01-20SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-20SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (7-Y 6-N 2-A)
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102858D

Same As/Similar To

SB1318 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22234(n/a)See Bill Text
22236(n/a)See Bill Text
22237(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1318
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1318+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1318S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1318H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+SB1318AS
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+SB1318ASR
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21200450D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1318F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1318FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1318FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12C0020+SB1318
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S05C0114+SB1318
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0288SB1318+SB1318
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0351SB1318+SB1318
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H11V0026+SB1318
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1862+SB1318
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1958+SB1318
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0489SB1318+SB1318

Bill Comments 750

feedback