VA SB1315 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0804)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0804)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia College Savings Plan. Makes several changes to the provisions that establish the Virginia College Savings Plan (the Plan), including (i) permitting the Plan to maintain an independent disbursement system for the disbursement of prepaid tuition contract benefits and (ii) requiring each prepaid tuition contract entered into on or after July 1, 2019, to include provisions for the application of tuition prepayments, at a rate equal to the percentage of enrollment-weighted average tuition at public institutions of higher education to be determined by the board, at (a) public institutions of higher education, (b) accredited nonprofit independent or private institutions of higher education, and (c) non-Virginia public and accredited nonprofit independent or private institutions of higher education, provided that no such payment is less than the sum of tuition prepayments made, less any fees as determined by the board. This bill is identical to HB 1972.
Title
Virginia College Savings Plan; prepaid tuition contracts, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0804) | |
2019-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 804 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1315ER) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Emergency clause deleted |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Title replaced 19106507D-H1 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1315H1 |
2019-02-11 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106507D-H1 |
2019-02-11 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-06 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106507D-H1 |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned App. sub: Higher Education |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/09/19 19101757D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 1 | 700 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |