VA SB1315 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Foster care; possession of firearm. Requires that possession of any firearms or other weapons in a foster home comply with federal and state laws and that the individual providing foster care services store all firearms, other weapons, and ammunition in a locked closet or cabinet unless they are being lawfully carried on the individual's person. The bill requires that the key or combination to the locked closet or cabinet be maintained out of the reach of all children in the home.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Foster care; possession of firearm.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (16-Y 24-N) (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 35-N) (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (11-Y 10-N) (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 1-N) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 5, 2017
2017-04-05SenateCommunicated to Governor
2017-04-05SenateSenate rejected Governor's recommendation (16-Y 24-N)
2017-03-24SenateGovernor's substitute printed 17105970D-S1
2017-03-24SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2017-03-13 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-03-13SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
2017-03-10SenateSigned by President
2017-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1315ER)
2017-03-07SenateEnrolled
2017-02-23HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 35-N)
2017-02-23HousePassed House (65-Y 35-N)
2017-02-23HousePending question ordered
2017-02-23HouseRead third time
2017-02-22HousePassed by for the day
2017-02-21HousePassed by for the day
2017-02-20HouseRead second time
2017-02-17HouseReported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (11-Y 10-N)
2017-02-16HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 1-N)
2017-02-06HouseAssigned MPPS sub: #1
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2017-02-03HouseRead first time
2017-02-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2017-01-31SenateRead second time and engrossed
2017-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2017-01-27SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 1-N)
2017-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2017-01-10SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100651D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
632904(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+SB1315
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1315+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1315ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1315S1+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S09V0044+SB1315
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0189SB1315+SB1315
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0225SB1315+SB1315
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H1501V0033+SB1315
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H15V0081+SB1315
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2723+SB1315
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1113SB1315+SB1315

Bill Comments

feedback