VA SB1314 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0571)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0571)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Judgment or order for pregnancy and delivery expenses. Provides that in the event that the initial petition for the establishment of parentage is commenced within six months of the live birth of a child, the judgment or order shall, except for good cause shown or as otherwise agreed to by the parties, apportion between the legal parents, in proportion to the legal parents' gross incomes, as used for calculating the monthly child support obligation, (i) the mother's unreimbursed pregnancy and delivery expenses and (ii) those reasonable expenses incurred by either parent for the benefit of the child prior to the birth of the child.
Title
Judgment or child support order; pregnancy and delivery expenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 41-N) (Y: 52 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (10-Y 9-N) (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (10-Y 9-N) (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0571) | |
2023-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 571 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1314ER) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-23 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-23 | House | VOTE: Passage (52-Y 41-N) |
2023-02-23 | House | Passed House with amendments (52-Y 41-N) |
2023-02-23 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2023-02-23 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2023-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (10-Y 9-N) |
2023-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 3-N) |
2023-02-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1314S1 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23106213D-S1 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23106213D-S1 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23104132D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2290 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0570)
HB2290 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0570)
HB2290 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0570)