VA SB1311 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1311
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Water quality standards; modification of permits and certifications. Requires an applicant for a natural gas transmission pipeline greater than 36 inches inside diameter to submit in the application a detailed erosion and sediment control plan and stormwater management plan in accordance with applicable regulations and subject to Department of Environmental Quality (the Department) review, modification, or approval. The bill requires such plans to be included in the Department's draft certification and decreases from 15 percent to 10 percent the slope grade that requires the inclusion of a description of all activities that will occur in upland areas in such application. If such project fail to provide adequate plans, the bill directs the Department to deny rather than waive certification under the federal Clean Water Act. Water quality standards; modification of permits and certifications. Requires an applicant for a natural gas transmission pipeline greater than 36 inches inside diameter to submit in the application a detailed erosion and sediment control plan and stormwater management plan in accordance with applicable regulations and subject to Department of Environmental Quality (the Department) review, modification, or approval. The bill requires such plans to be included in the Department's draft certification and decreases from 15 percent to 10 percent the slope grade that requires the inclusion of a description of all activities that will occur in upland areas in such application. If such project fail to provide adequate plans, the bill directs the Department to deny rather than waive certification under the federal Clean Water Act.
Title
Water quality standards; modification of permits and certifications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 17-N) (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (20-Y 17-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1311S1 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21104440D-S1 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Mason withdrawn 21104463D-S1 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 21104463D-S2 (Mason) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21104440D-S1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (8-Y 7-N) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102522D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1311 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 1 | 44.15:81 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.15:85 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |