VA SB1307 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Tabled in Rules (13-Y 5-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

University of Virginia; board of visitors; membership. Expands the membership of the University of Virginia board of visitors to include two nonvoting advisory members consisting of one faculty member of the University and one staff member of the University. The advisory faculty member shall be selected by the University faculty and the advisory staff member shall be selected by the University staff in the manner deemed appropriate by the faculty and staff, respectively.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

University of Virginia; expands membership of board of visitors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-14 - House - House: Tabled in Rules (13-Y 5-N) (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 16-N) (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-14HouseTabled in Rules (13-Y 5-N)
2023-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2023-02-13HouseRead first time
2023-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2023-01-24SenateRead third time and passed Senate (22-Y 16-N)
2023-01-23SenateRead second time and engrossed
2023-01-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2023-01-19SenateReported from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N)
2023-01-13SenateAssigned Education sub: Higher Education
2023-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2023-01-10SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103801D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2312201(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback