VA SB1306 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0077)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0077)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Twenty-fifth judicial circuit; designation of courtrooms. Provides that, where appropriate, the courthouse of the Circuit Court of Rockbridge County may be used for the trial of civil or criminal cases when venue is laid in the City of Buena Vista or the courthouse of the Circuit Court of the City of Buena Vista may be used for the trial of civil or criminal cases when venue is laid in Rockbridge County. Twenty-fifth judicial circuit; designation of courtrooms. Provides that, where appropriate, the courthouse of the Circuit Court of Rockbridge County may be used for the trial of civil or criminal cases when venue is laid in the City of Buena Vista or the courthouse of the Circuit Court of the City of Buena Vista may be used for the trial of civil or criminal cases when venue is laid in Rockbridge County.
Title
Twenty-fifth judicial circuit; designation of courtrooms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0077) | |
2023-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 77 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1306ER) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-23 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-23 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100568D |