VA SB1305 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1305

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Public Procurement Act; construction contracts; subcontractor workforce requirements. Requires all public bodies in a locality with a population in excess of 25,000 and covered institutions, defined in the bill, to include in every construction contract of more than $500,000 certain provisions related to the outsourcing of subcontracted work, which a contractor shall agree to during the performance of such contract. Such provisions mandate that a contractor shall only utilize subcontractors that certify in writing to the contractor that they will outsource no more than 10 percent of the cost of the work subcontracted for, excluding the provision of materials, with specified exceptions. Virginia Public Procurement Act; construction contracts; subcontractor workforce requirements. Requires all public bodies in a locality with a population in excess of 25,000 and covered institutions, defined in the bill, to include in every construction contract of more than $500,000 certain provisions related to the outsourcing of subcontracted work, which a contractor shall agree to during the performance of such contract. Such provisions mandate that a contractor shall only utilize subcontractors that certify in writing to the contractor that they will outsource no more than 10 percent of the cost of the work subcontracted for, excluding the provision of materials, with specified exceptions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Public Procurement Act; construction contracts, subcontractor workforce requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01HouseLeft in Appropriations
2021-02-19HousePassed by for the day in Appropriations Commerce, Agriculture and Natural Resources subcommittee
2021-02-17HouseAssigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources
2021-02-16HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-02-16HouseReported from General Laws (12-Y 9-N)
2021-02-16HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2021-02-16HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
2021-02-09HouseAssigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
2021-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-02-05HouseRead first time
2021-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-02SenatePassed Senate (21-Y 18-N)
2021-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02SenatePrinted as engrossed 21104037D-ES1
2021-02-02SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute with amendments SB1305ES1
2021-02-02SenateAmendments by Senator McPike agreed to
2021-02-02SenateReading of amendments waived
2021-02-02SenateEngrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01SenatePassed by for the day
2021-01-29SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1305S1
2021-01-29SenateSubstitute by Senator McPike agreed to 21104037D-S1
2021-01-29SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-01-29SenateCommittee amendment rejected
2021-01-29SenateReading of amendment waived
2021-01-29SenateCommittee amendments rejected
2021-01-29SenateReading of amendments waived
2021-01-29SenateRead second time
2021-01-29SenateFloor substitute printed 21104037D-S1 (McPike)
2021-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (9-Y 6-N)
2021-01-20SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-20SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (8-Y 7-N)
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102843D

Same As/Similar To

SB1305 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
224303.02(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1305
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1305+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1305S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1305ES1+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+SB1305AS
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+SB1305ASR
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1305F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1305FES1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12C0055+SB1305
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S05C0074+SB1305
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0161SB1305+SB1305
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0231SB1305+SB1305
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0232SB1305+SB1305
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0233SB1305+SB1305
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1104V0003+SB1305
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H11V0015+SB1305

Bill Comments 750

feedback