VA SB1304 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0332)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Court-appointed counsel; requests for additional compensation; determination by judge. Requires the presiding judge or chief judge of a circuit or district court, when reviewing a request from court-appointed counsel for additional compensation exceeding existing statutory limits, to provide, in writing, the reason for a determination that such request for additional compensation is not justified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Court-appointed counsel; requests for additional compensation, determination by judge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-23 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0332)
2023-03-23 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 332 (effective 7/1/23)
2023-03-13 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
2023-03-13SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023
2023-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-03-08SenateSigned by President
2023-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1304ER)
2023-03-07SenateEnrolled
2023-02-23HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N)
2023-02-23HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
2023-02-23HouseRead third time
2023-02-22HouseRead second time
2023-02-20HouseReported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N)
2023-02-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2023-02-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2023-02-10HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2023-02-10HouseRead first time
2023-02-10HousePlaced on Calendar
2023-02-06SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2023-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2023-02-06SenateRead second time and engrossed
2023-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2023-02-01SenateReported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2023-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2023-01-10SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103999D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192163(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+SB1304
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1304+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1304ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+CHAP0332+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1304F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1304FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S03V0148+SB1304
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0241SB1304+SB1304
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0276SB1304+SB1304
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0277SB1304+SB1304
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H0801V0226+SB1304
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H08V0315+SB1304
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV2269+SB1304

Bill Comments

feedback