VA SB1304 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1304
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Community services boards; discharge planning. Reduces from within 30 days to within 72 hours of an individual's identification as ready for discharge the time by which a community services board must document its disagreement with the determination that an individual is ready for discharge from a state hospital or training center. The bill also directs the Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to establish a work group with representatives of the Virginia Association of Community Services Boards to (i) review the current process for discharging patients from state mental health hospitals, including the current assigned responsibilities of state hospital staff and community services board staff, as well as the barriers to timely discharge for patients clinically ready to discharge, and (ii) develop potential options to expedite the discharge process for individuals who can be safely discharged back into the community. The bill directs the work group to develop a plan that includes recommendations for expediting the discharge process and identify the necessary funding to ensure that individuals receive essential services upon discharge and that discharges are timely. The bill requires the work group to report its findings and conclusions and its plan to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions and the Senate Committee on Education and Health by September 1, 2021. Community services boards; discharge planning. Reduces from within 30 days to within 72 hours of an individual's identification as ready for discharge the time by which a community services board must document its disagreement with the determination that an individual is ready for discharge from a state hospital or training center. The bill also directs the Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to establish a work group with representatives of the Virginia Association of Community Services Boards to (i) review the current process for discharging patients from state mental health hospitals, including the current assigned responsibilities of state hospital staff and community services board staff, as well as the barriers to timely discharge for patients clinically ready to discharge, and (ii) develop potential options to expedite the discharge process for individuals who can be safely discharged back into the community. The bill directs the work group to develop a plan that includes recommendations for expediting the discharge process and identify the necessary funding to ensure that individuals receive essential services upon discharge and that discharges are timely. The bill requires the work group to report its findings and conclusions and its plan to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions and the Senate Committee on Education and Health by September 1, 2021.
Title
Community services boards; discharge planning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21102367D-E |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1304E |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Committee amendment #2 rejected |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Committee amendments #1 and #3 agreed to |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102367D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1304 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote