VA SB1303 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Expungement and sealing of offenses resulting in a deferred and dismissed disposition or conviction by petition; defendant with a disorder or disability. Provides that a defendant with a disorder or disability, as defined in the bill, may file a petition that requests the sealing of the criminal history record information and court records of a Class 4 felony conviction or deferred and dismissed disposition. Under current law, Class 4 felony convictions or deferred and dismissed dispositions are ineligible to be sealed. The bill also provides that when a conviction or deferral and dismissal has been sealed, the defendant of such sealed record is a defendant with a disorder or disability, and the Governor granted the defendant a simple pardon for the commission of the crime or offense that was sealed, such conviction or deferral and dismissal shall be considered to be otherwise dismissed for purposes of expungement.
Title
Defendant with a disorder or disability; sealing of criminal history record information, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2023-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2023-02-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (10-Y 4-N) |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23104302D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 392.12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 392.2:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |