VA SB1303 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Local school divisions; virtual and in-person learning. Requires each local school division to make virtual and in-person learning available to all students by choice of the student's parent or guardian. Local school divisions; virtual and in-person learning. Requires each local school division to make virtual and in-person learning available to all students by choice of the student's parent or guardian.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local school divisions; availability of virtual and in-person learning to all students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Education by voice vote
2021-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2021-02-05HouseRead first time
2021-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-02SenateRead third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N)
2021-02-01SenatePrinted as engrossed 21102517D-E
2021-02-01SenateEmergency clause deleted
2021-02-01SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1303E
2021-02-01SenateAmendments by Senator Dunnavant agreed to
2021-02-01SenateReading of amendments waived
2021-02-01SenateRead second time
2021-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28SenateReported from Education and Health (8-Y 7-N)
2021-01-13SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/21 21102517D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback