VA SB1302 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1302
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0248)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0248)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crisis call center; Crisis Call Center Fund established. Provides that the crisis call center, which under current law is administered by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services (the Department), shall provide crisis intervention services and crisis care coordination to individuals accessing the National Suicide Prevention Lifeline from any jurisdiction in the Commonwealth 24 hours a day, seven days a week. The bill directs the Department, in its development of the crisis call center, community care teams, and mobile crisis teams, to comply with any applicable requirements of the National Suicide Hotline Designation Act of 2020 and to provide for consistency with federal guidelines promulgated under such law. The bill contains immunity provisions for any originating service provider and its employees and agents acting pursuant to the act. Crisis call center; Crisis Call Center Fund established. Provides that the crisis call center, which under current law is administered by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services (the Department), shall provide crisis intervention services and crisis care coordination to individuals accessing the National Suicide Prevention Lifeline from any jurisdiction in the Commonwealth 24 hours a day, seven days a week. The bill directs the Department, in its development of the crisis call center, community care teams, and mobile crisis teams, to comply with any applicable requirements of the National Suicide Hotline Designation Act of 2020 and to provide for consistency with federal guidelines promulgated under such law. The bill contains immunity provisions for any originating service provider and its employees and agents acting pursuant to the act. The bill creates a $0.12 surcharge on postpaid wireless charges and a $0.08 surcharge on prepaid wireless charges to be collected by the Department of Taxation and distributed to the Crisis Call Center Fund, established by the bill, to be used for establishing and administering the crisis call center. The bill also increases the wireless E-911 surcharge from $0.75 to $0.82 and the prepaid wireless E-911 charge from $0.50 to $0.55. The increased revenue shall be dedicated to public safety answering points.
Title
Crisis Call Center Fund; created, collection of 988 charges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (36-Y 1-N) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 7-N) (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 7-N) (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0248) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 248 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1302ER) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Title replaced 21200378D-H2 |
2021-02-19 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (36-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-19 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-19 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-19 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1302H2 |
2021-02-19 | House | Committee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 21200378D-H2 |
2021-02-19 | House | Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions substitute rejected 21200104D-H1 |
2021-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-17 | House | Committee substitute printed 21200378D-H2 |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-14 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-11 | House | Committee substitute printed 21200104D-H1 |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-09 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Behavioral Health |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 7-N) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1302S1 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103475D-S1 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103475D-S1 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102780D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1302 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 2 | 311.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 311.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 311.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 311.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |