VA SB1302 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Write-in votes; duties of local electoral boards. Provides that when no person is elected to an office by write-in votes and the difference between the total number of votes cast for the candidate elected or the candidate elected with the fewest number of votes and the total number of write-in votes cast for that office is more than five percent of the total number of write-in votes and the number of votes cast for such candidate elected, the electoral board is required only to ascertain and the abstract of votes is required only to contain the total number of write-in votes cast for that office.
Title
Write-in votes; duties of local electoral boards.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (7-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (7-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2017-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1302S1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104357D-S1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104357D-S1 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (7-Y 3-N) |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103065D |