VA SB1300 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1300
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Public Safety by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Public Safety by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Local and Regional Jails; review services provided to inmates during pregnancy, pregnancy termination, labor and delivery, and postpartum recovery; report. Directs the Board of Local and Regional Jails (the Board), in consultation with a stakeholder work group, to (i) identify and analyze all obstetric and gynecological services and any other services provided by local and regional jails to inmates during pregnancy, pregnancy termination, labor and delivery, and postpartum recovery; (ii) compare such services to best practices recommended by the American Correctional Association, American Jail Association, National Commission on Correctional Health Care, and American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists; and (iii) develop recommendations to ensure that proper services are provided to inmates during pregnancy, pregnancy termination, labor and delivery, and postpartum recovery. The bill directs the Board to (a) post its findings and recommendations on its website and report such findings and recommendations to the Secretary of Public Safety and Homeland Security and the Chairmen of the Senate Committee on the Judiciary, Senate Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services, House Committee for Courts of Justice, and House Committee on Public Safety by July 1, 2022, and (b) adopt regulations consistent with its findings and recommendations.
Title
Inmates; Board of Local and Regional Jails to review services provided during pregnancy, etc.
Sponsors
Sen. Barbara Favola [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] | Sen. Ghazala Hashmi [D] |
Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Public Safety by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102560D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1300 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Public Safety by voice vote