VA SB1298 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1298

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0500)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Tourism improvement districts. Authorizes any locality to create a local tourism improvement district plan, consisting of fees charged to businesses and used to fund tourism promotion activities and capital improvements. Under the bill, the locality is authorized to contract with a nonprofit entity to administer the activities and improvements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tourism improvement districts; authorizes any locality to create.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (62-Y 36-N) (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 35-N) (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0500)
2021-03-31 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 500 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-24 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-24SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 24, 2021
2021-02-22SenateSigned by President
2021-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-19SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1298ER)
2021-02-19SenateEnrolled
2021-02-17HouseVOTE: Passage #2 (62-Y 36-N)
2021-02-17HousePassed House (62-Y 36-N)
2021-02-17HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2021-02-17HouseVOTE: Passage (64-Y 35-N)
2021-02-17HousePassed House (64-Y 35-N)
2021-02-17HouseRead third time
2021-02-16HouseRead second time
2021-02-12HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N)
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2021-01-18SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-18SenateReported from Local Government (14-Y 1-N)
2021-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2021-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102381D

Same As/Similar To

SB1298 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522413.1(n/a)See Bill Text
1522413.11(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1298
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1298+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1298ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0500+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S07C0010+SB1298
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S05C0058+SB1298
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0148SB1298+SB1298
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0178SB1298+SB1298
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H07V0002+SB1298
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1646+SB1298
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1665+SB1298

Bill Comments 750

feedback