VA SB1296 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1296
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Public Safety by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Public Safety by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
State Coordinator of Emergency Management; establishment of Emergency Management Equity Working Group. Provides for the State Coordinator of Emergency Management to establish an Emergency Management Equity Working Group to ensure that emergency management programs and plans provide support to at-risk individuals and populations disproportionately impacted by disasters.
Title
Emergency Management Equity Working Group; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Public Safety by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102794D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1296 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Public Safety by voice vote