VA SB1296 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0833)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

County food and beverage tax; referendum. Prohibits a county from holding a new referendum on the levy of a food and beverage tax in the three calendar years subsequent to its electoral defeat, but only if such referendum is initiated by a resolution of the board of supervisors. The bill also requires the ballot for any such referendum to state the total tax, as a percentage, that would be imposed on food and beverage if the referendum were to pass, based upon a four percent food and beverage tax and any other ad valorem taxes applicable to the purchase of prepared food and beverage in the county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County food and beverage tax; referendum.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation #3 (17-Y 23-N) (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendations #'s 1-2 (14-Y 26-N) (Y: 14 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 31-N 1-A) (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 8-N) (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0833)
2017-04-26 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 833 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 5, 2017
2017-04-05SenateCommunicated to Governor
2017-04-05SenateSenate rejected Governor's recommendation #3 (17-Y 23-N)
2017-04-05SenateSenate rejected Governor's recommendations #'s 1-2 (14-Y 26-N)
2017-03-24SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2017-02-23 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-02-23SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/17
2017-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-22SenateSigned by President
2017-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1296ER)
2017-02-22SenateEnrolled
2017-02-17SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (32-Y 8-N)
2017-02-15HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 31-N 1-A)
2017-02-15HousePassed House with amendment (67-Y 31-N 1-A)
2017-02-15HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2017-02-15HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2017-02-15HouseRead third time
2017-02-14HouseRead second time
2017-02-13HouseReported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 6-N)
2017-02-08HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 1-N)
2017-02-03HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2017-01-31HouseRead first time
2017-01-31HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-01-27SenatePassed Senate (32-Y 7-N)
2017-01-27SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2017-01-27SenateRead third time and passed Senate (31-Y 8-N)
2017-01-26SenateRead second time and engrossed
2017-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-01-24SenateReported from Finance (15-Y 1-N)
2017-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2017-01-10SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103024D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5813833(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+SB1296
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1296+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1296ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0833+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S05V0070+SB1296
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0122SB1296+SB1296
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0160SB1296+SB1296
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0162SB1296+SB1296
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0163SB1296+SB1296
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H1001V0032+SB1296
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H10V0141+SB1296
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2352+SB1296
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0644SB1296+SB1296
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1110SB1296+SB1296
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1111SB1296+SB1296

Bill Comments

feedback