VA SB1295 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0172)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0172)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; tobacco products and nicotine vapor products. Requires each school board to (i) develop and implement a policy to prohibit the use and distribution of tobacco products and nicotine vapor products on a school bus, on school property, or at an on-site or off-site school-sponsored activity and (ii) include in its code of student conduct a prohibition against possessing tobacco products or nicotine vapor products on a school bus, on school property, or at an on-site or off-site school-sponsored activity. Current law only places these requirements on each school board with regard to electronic cigarettes. The bill requires such policy to include adequate provisions for enforcement among students, employees, and visitors, including the enumeration of possible sanctions or disciplinary action consistent with state or federal law, and referrals to resources to help staff and students overcome tobacco addiction. This bill is identical to HB 2384.
Title
Public schools; tobacco products and nicotine vapor products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 14-N) (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 14-N) (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0172) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 172 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-18 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1295ER) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-12 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 14-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed House with amendment (85-Y 14-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2019-02-08 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-08 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported from Education with amendment (20-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1295S1 |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105237D-S1 |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Incorporates SB1056 (Marsden) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105237D-S1 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102386D |