VA SB1292 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-01 - Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (11-Y 3-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Electric utilities; overearnings; customer bill credits. Requires the State Corporation Commission to direct that 100 percent of the amount of a utility's earnings above a certain threshold be credited to customers' bills. Under current law, the Commission is required to direct that 70 percent of such overearnings be credited to customers' bills. The provisions of the bill apply to the first triennial review of Dominion Energy Virginia conducted after January 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric utilities; overearnings, customer bill credits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-01SenatePassed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (11-Y 3-N)
2021-01-25SenateAssigned C&L sub: Energy
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2021-01-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102020D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback