VA SB1292 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0504)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Residential Property Disclosure Act; required disclosures. Adds to the required residential property disclosure that is furnished by the owner to a buyer (i) that the owner of residential real property makes no representations or warranties as to the condition of the real property with regard to any conveyances of mineral rights and (ii) that before purchasing residential property, a buyer should exercise due diligence in determining whether property is located in a special flood hazard area by contacting the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) or visiting the website for FEMA's National Flood Insurance Program or for the Virginia Department of Conservation and Recreation's Flood Risk Information System.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Residential Property Disclosure Act; required disclosures, mineral rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0504)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 504 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1292ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-20SenateTitle replaced 19106761D-H1
2019-02-20SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1292H1
2019-02-19HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106761D-H1
2019-02-19HouseRead third time
2019-02-18HouseRead second time
2019-02-14HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106761D-H1
2019-02-14HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-02-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N)
2019-01-23SenateReported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
2019-01-07SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103177D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1292
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1292+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1292H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1292ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0504+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0116+SB1292
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0196SB1292+SB1292
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0221SB1292+SB1292
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1104V0030+SB1292
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0270+SB1292
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2939+SB1292
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2982+SB1292
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0871SB1292+SB1292

Bill Comments

feedback