VA SB129 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-01 - Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (11-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-01 - Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (11-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Minimum wage. Increases the minimum wage from its current federally mandated level of $7.25 per hour to $8.00 per hour effective July 1, 2016, to $9.00 per hour effective July 1, 2017, and to $10.10 per hour effective July 1, 2018, unless a higher minimum wage is required by the federal Fair Labor Standards Act FLSA). The measure also provides that the Virginia minimum wage applies to persons whose employment is covered by the FLSA.
Title
Minimum wage; increases minimum wage from its current federally mandated level to $8.00 per hour.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (11-Y 4-N) |
2015-12-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-12-29 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101702D |