VA SB1283 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; regional charter school divisions. Authorizes the Board of Education (the Board) to establish regional charter school divisions consisting of at least two but not more than three existing school divisions in regions in which each underlying school division has an enrollment of more than 3,000 students and one or more schools that have accreditation denied status for two out of the past three years. The bill requires such regional charter school divisions to be supervised by a school board that consists of eight members appointed by the Board and one member appointed by the localities of each of the underlying divisions. The bill authorizes the school board, after a review by the Board, to review and approve public charter school applications in the regional charter school divisions and to contract with the applicant. The bill requires that the state share of Standards of Quality per pupil funding of the underlying school district in which the student resides be transferred to such school. This bill is identical to HB 2342.
Title
Public schools; Board of Education shall only establish regional charter school divisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's veto agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (54-Y 43-N) (Y: 54 N: 43 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Education (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (10-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's veto agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (54-Y 43-N) (Y: 54 N: 43 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Education (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (10-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Senate | Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate sustained Governor's veto (21-Y 19-N) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reconsideration of Governor's veto agreed to (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate sustained Governor's veto (20-Y 20-N) |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1283ER) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-20 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (54-Y 43-N) |
2017-02-20 | House | Passed House (54-Y 43-N) |
2017-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-17 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported from Appropriations (15-Y 7-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-13 | House | Reported from Education (14-Y 8-N) |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1283S1 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17105114D-S1 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance (10-Y 5-N 1-A) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 6-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17105114D-S1 |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102226D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 212.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 212.16:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 212.16:7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 25 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 57.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 57.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |