VA SB1282 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1282
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0098)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0098)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Greenhouse gas emissions inventory; regulations. Directs the Department of Environmental Quality to conduct a statewide baseline and projection inventory of all greenhouse gas emissions and to update such inventory every four years. The bill requires that the inventory be published and included in the annual report of the State Air Pollution Control Board. The bill also authorizes the Board to adopt regulations necessary to collect data needed to conduct, update, and maintain the inventory. The bill exempts proprietary information collected by the Department from the mandatory disclosure requirements of the Virginia Freedom of Information Act. Greenhouse gas emissions inventory; regulations. Directs the Department of Environmental Quality to conduct a statewide baseline and projection inventory of all greenhouse gas emissions and to update such inventory every four years. The bill requires that the inventory be published and included in the annual report of the State Air Pollution Control Board. The bill also authorizes the Board to adopt regulations necessary to collect data needed to conduct, update, and maintain the inventory. The bill exempts proprietary information collected by the Department from the mandatory disclosure requirements of the Virginia Freedom of Information Act.
Title
Greenhouse gas emissions inventory; regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 44-N) (Y: 56 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 16-N) (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 16-N) (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0098) | |
2021-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 98 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1282ER) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-22 | House | VOTE: Passage (56-Y 44-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | Passed House (56-Y 44-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (13-Y 8-N) |
2021-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) |
2021-02-09 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 16-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1282S1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103680D-S1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 4-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103680D-S1 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (9-Y 6-N) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101991D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1282 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote