VA SB1282 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0835)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Wireless communications infrastructure. Provides a uniform procedure for the way in which small cell facilities on existing structures are approved by localities and approved and installed in public rights-of-way. The measure includes provisions that establish requirements applicable to the location of micro-wireless facilities. The measure also addresses restrictions by localities and the Department of Transportation regarding the use of public rights-of-way or easements and specifies when a permittee may be required to relocate wireless support structures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wireless communications infrastructure; procedure for approved by localities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendations #'s 1-7 (38-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendations #'s 1-7 agreed to (38-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendations #'s 1-7 (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (32-Y 4-N 2-A) (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N 1-A) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 17-N 1-A) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0835)
2017-04-26 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 835 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 5, 2017
2017-04-05SenateCommunicated to Governor
2017-04-05HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2017-04-05SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2017-04-05SenateReenrolled bill text (SB1282ER2)
2017-04-05SenateReenrolled
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted in-part
2017-04-05HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation to Amendments # 1-7 (98-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendations #'s 1-7 (38-Y 0-N 2-A)
2017-04-05SenateReconsideration of Governor's recommendations #'s 1-7 agreed to (38-Y 0-N 2-A)
2017-04-05SenateRecommendation #8 passed by for the day
2017-04-05SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendations #'s 1-7 (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
2017-03-27SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2017-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
2017-02-21SenateSigned by President
2017-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-20SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1282ER)
2017-02-20SenateEnrolled
2017-02-15SenateTitle replaced 17105460D-H2
2017-02-15SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (32-Y 4-N 2-A)
2017-02-14HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2017-02-14HousePassed House with substitute (97-Y 0-N)
2017-02-14HouseEngrossed by House - floor substitute SB1282H2
2017-02-14HouseSubstitute by Delegate Kilgore agreed to 17105460D-H2
2017-02-14HouseCommittee substitute rejected 17105221D-H1
2017-02-14HouseRead third time
2017-02-14HouseFloor substitute printed 17105460D-H2 (Kilgore)
2017-02-13HouseRead second time
2017-02-09HouseCommittee substitute printed 17105221D-H1
2017-02-09HouseReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2017-02-08HouseRead first time
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-03SenatePassed Senate (21-Y 18-N 1-A)
2017-02-03SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
2017-02-03SenateRead third time and passed Senate (21-Y 17-N 1-A)
2017-02-02SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1282S1
2017-02-02SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 17104435D-S1
2017-02-02SenateReading of substitute waived
2017-02-02SenateRead second time
2017-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-01-30SenateCommittee substitute printed 17104435D-S1
2017-01-30SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 0-N 2-A)
2017-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2017-01-10SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103885D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522316.3(n/a)See Bill Text
1522316.7(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+SB1282
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1282+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1282S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1282H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1282H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1282ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1282ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0835+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S02V0047+SB1282
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0229SB1282+SB1282
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0274SB1282+SB1282
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0276SB1282+SB1282
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0277SB1282+SB1282
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H14V0123+SB1282
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H14V0125+SB1282
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2300+SB1282
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0567SB1282+SB1282
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1105SB1282+SB1282
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1108SB1282+SB1282
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1109SB1282+SB1282
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2914+SB1282

Bill Comments

feedback