VA SB1281 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Elections; qualifications of the general registrar, residency. Removes the requirement that the general registrar of a locality be a resident of that locality or an adjacent locality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General registrar; qualifications, residency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 8-N) (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (13-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-25SenateRead third time and passed Senate (31-Y 8-N)
2021-01-22SenatePrinted as engrossed 21101704D-E
2021-01-22SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1281E
2021-01-22SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-01-22SenateReading of amendments waived
2021-01-22SenateRead second time
2021-01-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19SenateReported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (13-Y 0-N 2-A)
2021-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101704D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242110(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback