VA SB1280 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1280
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Dams; negotiated settlement agreements. Authorizes the Virginia Soil and Water Conservation Board to enter into a negotiated settlement with the owners of certain impounding structures who have allegedly violated or failed, neglected, or refused to obey any permit condition, provision of the Dam Safety Act, or Board regulation or order. The settlement shall require the dam owner to correct deficiencies at the dam structure and to pay civil charges for past alleged violations instead of any appropriate civil penalty that could be imposed. Such civil charges shall be suspended upon compliance with the settlement agreement.
Title
Dams; negotiated settlement agreements.
Sponsors
Sen. John Bell [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102055D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1280 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote