VA SB1278 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Charitable gaming; regulations; Texas Hold'em poker games. Clarifies that the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services (the Department) has specific authority to approve and regulate operators of both Texas Hold'em poker games and Texas Hold'em poker tournaments. The bill provides that a qualified organization may conduct both Texas Hold'em poker games and tournaments, but at no time shall conduct more than three such games or tournaments simultaneously. Current law is unclear as to whether such organization may conduct Texas Hold'em poker games in addition to Texas Hold'em poker tournaments. Charitable gaming; regulations; Texas Hold'em poker games. Clarifies that the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services (the Department) has specific authority to approve and regulate operators of both Texas Hold'em poker games and Texas Hold'em poker tournaments. The bill provides that a qualified organization may conduct both Texas Hold'em poker games and tournaments, but at no time shall conduct more than three such games or tournaments simultaneously. Current law is unclear as to whether such organization may conduct Texas Hold'em poker games in addition to Texas Hold'em poker tournaments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charitable gaming; regulations of operators of Texas Hold'em poker games.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
2021-02-07HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-02-07HouseRead first time
2021-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-05SenateRead third time and passed Senate (34-Y 4-N 1-A)
2021-02-04SenatePrinted as engrossed 21101863D-E
2021-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1278E
2021-02-04SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2021-02-04SenateReading of amendment waived
2021-02-04SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-02-04SenateReading of amendments waived
2021-02-04SenateRead second time
2021-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-01-27SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-27SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101863D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182334.2(n/a)See Bill Text
182340.16(n/a)See Bill Text
182340.18(n/a)See Bill Text
182340.19(n/a)See Bill Text
182340.22(n/a)See Bill Text
182340.28:2(n/a)See Bill Text
182340.34:2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback