VA SB1277 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0343)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Certificate of public need; hospitals and nursing homes; disaster exemption; regulations. Provides for a 30-day exemption from the requirement to obtain a certificate of public need for an increase in the total number of beds in existing hospitals or nursing homes if the State Health Commissioner has determined that a natural or man-made disaster has caused the evacuation of a hospital or nursing home and that a public health emergency exists due to a shortage of hospital or nursing home beds. The Board of Health shall adopt regulations for this exemption. This bill is identical to HB 1870.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Certificate of public need; nursing homes and hospitals, disaster exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0343)
2019-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 343 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-27 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-27SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019
2019-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-20SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1277ER)
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled
2019-02-15SenateTitle replaced 19106703D-H1
2019-02-15SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1277H1
2019-02-13HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106703D-H1
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-12HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106703D-H1
2019-02-12HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101545D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321102.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1277
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1277+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1277H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1277ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0343+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0155+SB1277
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0313SB1277+SB1277
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0347SB1277+SB1277
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0348SB1277+SB1277
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0156+SB1277
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2708+SB1277
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0680SB1277+SB1277

Bill Comments

feedback