VA SB1276 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0051)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0051)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local disability services. Eliminates the Disability Services Council and the State Rehabilitative Services Incentive Fund, the requirement that localities establish local disability services boards, and the authority of localities to establish local rehabilitative services incentive funds.
Title
Local disability services; agencies may convene local interagency services teams.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 26-N) (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0051) | |
2011-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 51 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-18 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1276ER) | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-15 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 26-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Passed House (72-Y 26-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-14 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-11 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 3-N) | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11104098D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1535 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 47 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 5.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 52 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |