VA SB1275 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1275
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0437)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0437)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; presumption of compensability for certain diseases. Provides that the occupational disease presumption for death caused by hypertension or heart disease will apply for salaried or volunteer emergency medical services personnel who have at least five years of service and are operating in a locality that has legally adopted a resolution declaring that it will provide one or more of such presumptions. The provisions of the bill do not apply to any individual who was diagnosed with hypertension or heart disease before July 1, 2021.
Title
Workers' compensation; presumption of compensability for certain diseases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0437) | |
2021-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 437 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1275ER) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-23 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-19 | House | VOTE: Passage (97-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2021-02-19 | House | Passed House with amendment (97-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2021-02-19 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2021-02-19 | House | Amendment by Delegate Heretick agreed to |
2021-02-19 | House | Committee substitute rejected 21200127D-H1 |
2021-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-18 | House | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-17 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-15 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-12 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-11 | House | Committee substitute printed 21200127D-H1 |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21103758D-ES1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1275ES1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103758D-S1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103758D-S1 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101397D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1275 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
HB1818 (Same As) 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0436)
HB1818 (Same As) 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0436)
HB1818 (Same As) 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0436)
HB1818 (Same As) 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0436)