VA SB1275 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Failed to report (defeated) in Education (11-Y 11-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Failed to report (defeated) in Education (11-Y 11-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Junior Reserve Officer Training programs; students receiving home instruction. Requires any school board that offers a Junior Reserve Officers Training Corps program to make the program available to any student who receives home instruction and resides in the local school division. The bill prohibits any such school board from requiring any such student to enroll on a full or part-time basis or to meet other eligibility requirements for such a program beyond those required of public school students. The bill provides that such a student may demonstrate compliance with any academic achievement requirements for participation in such a program in any manner acceptable as evidence of progress under the home instruction provisions of the Code.
Title
Junior Reserve Officer Training programs; availability to students receiving home instruction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Education (11-Y 11-N) (Y: 11 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | Failed to report (defeated) in Education (11-Y 11-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 5-N) |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101567D |