VA SB1273 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1273
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0313)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0313)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Behavioral Health Commission created. Creates the Behavioral Health Commission in the legislative branch of state government for the purpose of (i) studying and making recommendations for the improvement of behavioral health services and the behavioral health service system in the Commonwealth to encourage the adoption of policies to increase the quality and availability of and ensure access to the full continuum of high-quality, effective, and efficient behavioral health services for all persons in the Commonwealth and (ii) providing ongoing oversight of behavioral health services and the behavioral health service system in the Commonwealth, including monitoring and evaluation of established programs, services, and delivery and payment structures and implementation of new services and initiatives in the Commonwealth and development of recommendations for improving such programs, services, structures, and implementation. Behavioral Health Commission created. Creates the Behavioral Health Commission in the legislative branch of state government for the purpose of (i) studying and making recommendations for the improvement of behavioral health services and the behavioral health service system in the Commonwealth to encourage the adoption of policies to increase the quality and availability of and ensure access to the full continuum of high-quality, effective, and efficient behavioral health services for all persons in the Commonwealth and (ii) providing ongoing oversight of behavioral health services and the behavioral health service system in the Commonwealth, including monitoring and evaluation of established programs, services, and delivery and payment structures and implementation of new services and initiatives in the Commonwealth and development of recommendations for improving such programs, services, structures, and implementation.
Title
Behavioral Health Commission; established, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0313) | |
2021-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 313 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1273ER) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-24 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2021-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21101274D-E |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1273E |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Rules with amendments (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101274D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1273 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
General Assembly
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
General Assembly
Study Commissions Committees and Reports