VA SB1271 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1271

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0490)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Freedom of Information Act; meetings held through electronic communication means during a state of emergency. Allows a public body, or a joint meeting thereof, to meet by electronic communication means without a quorum of the public body physically assembled at one location when a locality in which the public body is located has declared a local state of emergency, provided that (i) the catastrophic nature of the declared emergency makes it impracticable or unsafe to assemble a quorum in a single location and (ii) the purpose of the meeting is to provide for the continuity of operations of the public body or the discharge of its lawful purposes, duties, and responsibilities. Under current law, public bodies may only meet in such manner when the Governor has declared a state of emergency and only for the purpose of addressing the emergency. Finally, the bill requires public bodies meeting through electronic communication means during a local or state declaration of a state of emergency to (a) make arrangements for public access to such meeting through electronic communication means, including videoconferencing if already used by the public body, and (b) provide the public with the opportunity to comment at such meetings when public comment is customarily received. Virginia Freedom of Information Act; meetings held through electronic communication means during a state of emergency. Allows a public body, or a joint meeting thereof, to meet by electronic communication means without a quorum of the public body physically assembled at one location when a locality in which the public body is located has declared a local state of emergency, provided that (i) the catastrophic nature of the declared emergency makes it impracticable or unsafe to assemble a quorum in a single location and (ii) the purpose of the meeting is to provide for the continuity of operations of the public body or the discharge of its lawful purposes, duties, and responsibilities. Under current law, public bodies may only meet in such manner when the Governor has declared a state of emergency and only for the purpose of addressing the emergency. Finally, the bill requires public bodies meeting through electronic communication means during a local or state declaration of a state of emergency to (a) make arrangements for public access to such meeting through electronic communication means, including videoconferencing if already used by the public body, and (b) provide the public with the opportunity to comment at such meetings when public comment is customarily received.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Freedom of Information Act; meetings held through electronic communication means.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (47-Y 44-N 1-A) (Y: 47 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0490)
2021-03-31 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 490 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-15SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021
2021-03-11HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-09SenateSigned by President
2021-03-09SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1271ER)
2021-03-09SenateEnrolled
2021-02-27HouseVOTE: Agreed To (54-Y 45-N)
2021-02-27HouseConference report agreed to by House (54-Y 45_N)
2021-02-27SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (27-Y 12-N)
2021-02-27 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2021-02-25HouseDelegates: Simon, Carr, Orrock
2021-02-25HouseConferees appointed by House
2021-02-25SenateSenators: McPike, Stuart, Boysko
2021-02-25SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2021-02-25SenateSenate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-25HouseHouse requested conference committee
2021-02-25HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2021-02-24SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N)
2021-02-23HouseVOTE: Passage (47-Y 44-N 1-A)
2021-02-23HousePassed House with substitute (47-Y 44-N 1-A)
2021-02-23HouseEngrossed by House - floor substitute SB1271H1
2021-02-23HouseSubstitute by Delegate Simon agreed to 21200596D-H1
2021-02-23HouseRead third time
2021-02-23HouseFloor substitute printed 21200596D-H1 (Simon)
2021-02-22HouseRead second time
2021-02-18HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2021-02-16HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2021-02-09HouseAssigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-26SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101309D

Same As/Similar To

SB1271 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
223708.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1271
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1271+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1271H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1271ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0490+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+SB1271AC
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1271F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1271FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1271FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12C0013+SB1271
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0080SB1271+SB1271
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0120SB1271+SB1271
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1104V0002+SB1271
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H11V0024+SB1271
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1869+SB1271
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0413SB1271+SB1271
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0493SB1271+SB1271
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0530SB1271+SB1271
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV2014+SB1271

Bill Comments 750

feedback