VA SB1271 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0351)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0351)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Oil and gas wells; bonding requirements; application notice. Authorizes a person who applies for a hearing in front of the Virginia Gas and Oil Board to provide required notice of such application to certain gas or oil owners, coal owners, mineral owners, or gas storage field operators by commercial delivery service. Current law provides for delivery only by certified mail. The bill changes the blanket bond amounts that the Director of the Department of Mines, Minerals and Energy may require for an application for permits for gas or oil operations and authorizes additional bonds for any well proposed to be drilled in the Tidewater region.
Title
Oil and gas wells; bonding requirements, application notice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 3-N) (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0351) | |
2019-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 351 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1271ER) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-15 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed House (92-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19102058D-E |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1271E |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102058D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 1 | 361.19 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 361.31 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |